SD HB1133 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that the cost of a home study required for an adoption is the responsibility of the Department of Social Services.
Title
Provide that the cost of a home study required for an adoption is the responsibility of the Department of Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Deferred to another day (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Deferred to another day (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 536 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 629 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 467 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 466 Amendment 1133D |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 444 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 329 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 431 |
2022-02-17 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-17 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-10 | House | Health and Human Services Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-10 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. Amendment 1133A |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 126 |