SD HB1131 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 614
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain road district trustees and employees to receive compensation under a district contract.
Title
Authorize certain road district trustees and employees to receive compensation under a district contract.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Drew Dennert [R] | Rep. Greg Jamison [R] | Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] |
Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] |
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. James Schaefer [R] | Sen. Stace Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 614 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 548 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 541 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 501 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 487 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 460 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 331 |
2018-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 255 |
2018-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-30 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 219 |
2018-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 148 |