SD HB1131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 479
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain taxes and fees to fund improvements to public roads and bridges in South Dakota.
Title
Revise certain taxes and fees to fund improvements to public roads and bridges in South Dakota.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Deferred to another day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Deferred to another day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 479 |
2015-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | House | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131fc |
2015-02-18 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131fe |
2015-02-18 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131fb |
2015-02-18 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131oa |
2015-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 258 |
2015-02-03 | House | Transportation Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. |
2015-02-03 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131fc |
2015-02-03 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131fe |
2015-02-03 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131fb |
2015-02-03 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1131oa |
2015-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 199 |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House H.J. 182 |