SD HB1122 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor H.J. 843
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain requirements relating to health insurance plans for county officers and employees.
Title
Revise certain requirements relating to health insurance plans for county officers and employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 843 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 815 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 763 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 673 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 673 Amendment 1122ta |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 651 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 592 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 327 |
2013-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 291 |
2013-01-31 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 269 |
2013-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 130 |