SD HB1119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain references to secondary elections.
Title
Revise certain references to secondary elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530 |
2021-03-03 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 481 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 384 |
2021-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 435 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 351 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 208 |
2021-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 226 |
2021-02-04 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-04 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 154 |