SD HB1117 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor H.J. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor H.J. 604
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the approval of postsecondary courses for certain nonpublic school students and students receiving alternative instruction.
Title
Provide for the approval of postsecondary courses for certain nonpublic school students and students receiving alternative instruction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 604 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 552 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 550 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 509 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 487 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 304 |
2015-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 294 |
2015-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 276 |
2015-01-30 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 241 |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 179 |