SD HB1088 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update requirements for an insurance company seeking to do business in this state.
Title
Update requirements for an insurance company seeking to do business in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370 |
2023-02-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 16, 2023 H.J. 312 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 278 |
2023-02-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 251 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 192 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 14 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 14 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 127 |
2023-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 105 |
2023-01-23 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-01-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2023-01-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088A |
2023-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 52 |