SD HB1088 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-6)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2017 H.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-6)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2017 H.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding required stops at railroad crossings.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding required stops at railroad crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2017 H.J. 482 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2017 H.J. 479 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 462 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 422 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 403 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 382 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 342 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 332 |
2017-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 314 |
2017-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 296 |
2017-02-02 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 267 |
2017-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 191 |