SD HB1088 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 800
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the rights of certain new vehicle dealers and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the rights of certain new vehicle dealers and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Signed by Governor H.J. 800 | |
2010-03-04 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 664 | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 498 | |
2010-02-25 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 481 | |
2010-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 456 | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 210 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 248 | |
2010-01-27 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 188 | |
2010-01-27 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088oa | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 137 |