SD HB1086 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create a leased residential property classification and to establish the school district general fund levy for the property classification.
Title
Create a leased residential property classification and to establish the school district general fund levy for the property classification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 307 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 225 |
2014-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 20. H.J. 283 |
2014-01-30 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 3. H.J. 172 |
2014-01-30 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1086fa |
2014-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 80 |