SD HB1086 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 542
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permit certain municipalities to issue an additional off-sale alcoholic beverage license.
Title
Permit certain municipalities to issue an additional off-sale alcoholic beverage license.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 542 | |
2010-03-03 | Local Government Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4. | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 230 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 28. H.J. 272 | |
2010-02-02 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 272 Amendment 1086fa | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 252 | |
2010-01-27 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 193 | |
2010-01-27 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1086sb | |
2010-01-27 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1086sa | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 136 |