SD HB1075 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain outdated provisions regarding annexation near airports.
Title
Repeal certain outdated provisions regarding annexation near airports.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Sen. David Johnson [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] |
Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 20, 2020 H.J. 326 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 259 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 304 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 230 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 142 |
2020-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 116 |
2020-01-30 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-01-30 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred to House Transportation H.J. 58 |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading House H.J. 50 |