SD HB1071 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Signed by Governor H.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Signed by Governor H.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the number of signatures required for a nominating petition for sanitary district trustees.
Title
Revise the number of signatures required for a nominating petition for sanitary district trustees.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] |
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 422 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 402 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 381 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 375 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 340 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 313 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 236 |
2015-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 207 |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 174 |
2015-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 84 |