SD HB1066 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 655
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Require students to take a civics test before graduating from high school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require students to take a civics test before graduating from high school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 38 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 13, NAYS 21. S.J. 655
2019-03-07SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 655 Amendment 1066cf
2019-03-06SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632
2019-03-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607
2019-03-04SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 595
2019-02-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
2019-02-26SenateEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 517
2019-02-26SenateEducation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1066cd
2019-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 401
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 418 Amendment 1066ota
2019-02-14HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 31. H.J. 418
2019-02-13HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 389
2019-02-12HouseDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed H.J. 379
2019-02-08HouseEducation Title amended, Passed H.J. 338 Amendment 1066bta
2019-02-08HouseEducation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3.
2019-02-08HouseEducation Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1066be
2019-02-08HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-23HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 159

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1066&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1066P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1066HED.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1066H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/HB1066SED.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28020&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28354&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28847&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29312&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29313&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback