SD HB1066 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-14)
Status: Passed on February 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-14)
Status: Passed on February 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 280
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continue the current rate of the gross receipts tax imposed on visitor-related businesses.
Title
Continue the current rate of the gross receipts tax imposed on visitor-related businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 280 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 276 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 261 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 283 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 270 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 235 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 219 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 181 |
2013-01-18 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 115 |
2013-01-17 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. H.J. 93 |
2013-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-15 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 74 |