SD HB1063 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain outdated and obsolete provisions regarding the Bureau of Information and Telecommunications.
Title
Repeal certain outdated and obsolete provisions regarding the Bureau of Information and Telecommunications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 348 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 292 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 297 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 261 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 266 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 232 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 117 |
2013-01-15 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 2. H.J. 75 |
2013-01-11 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 56 |
2013-01-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 32 |