SD HB1058 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Local Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the recall of county commissioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the recall of county commissioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House Local Government: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseLocal Government Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2021-01-26HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended
2021-01-26HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1058A
2021-01-26HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21HouseLocal Government Deferred to another day, Passed
2021-01-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 31
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 25

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback