SD HB1057 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 47-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit certain acts against children and provide a penalty therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit certain acts against children and provide a penalty therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateHealth and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2020-02-10SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 5.
2020-02-10SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057P
2020-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 121
2020-01-29HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 23. H.J. 85
2020-01-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 63
2020-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 57
2020-01-22HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
2020-01-22HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057C
2020-01-22HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057B
2020-01-22HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057A
2020-01-22HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 19

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback