SD HB1054 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain record keeping and inspection requirements for fur dealers.
Title
Revise certain record keeping and inspection requirements for fur dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 406 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 390 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 361 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 354 |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 324 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 298 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-29 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 236 |
2015-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 209 |
2015-01-27 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 175 |
2015-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 39 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 32 |