SD HB1050 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-03 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 41. H.J. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modify certain publishing requirements in official newspapers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify certain publishing requirements in official newspapers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-21 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 29, NAYS 41. H.J. 198
2021-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 197 Amendment 1050C
2021-01-26HouseFiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 131
2021-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 118
2021-01-21HouseLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
2021-01-21HouseLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1050A
2021-01-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 34
2021-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback