SD HB1043 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Require the Department of Social Services to collect and report certain information regarding the military affiliation of a parent whose child is subject to a report of abuse or neglect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require the Department of Social Services to collect and report certain information regarding the military affiliation of a parent whose child is subject to a report of abuse or neglect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSigned by the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 426
2019-02-13SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 386
2019-02-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 358
2019-02-11SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 319
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-07SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 300
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 201
2019-01-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 211
2019-01-23HouseMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 166
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17HouseReferred to House Military and Veterans Affairs, Passed H.J. 140
2019-01-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 50

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback