SD HB1038 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify certain provisions relating to orders issued for examinations of certain insurers.
Title
Clarify certain provisions relating to orders issued for examinations of certain insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 622 | |
2010-02-25 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 469 | |
2010-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 591 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 410 | |
2010-02-19 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 389 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-18 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 363 | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-22 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 124 | |
2010-01-21 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 151 | |
2010-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-01-20 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 135 | |
2010-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 25 |