SD HB1029 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 651
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt persons hunting mountain lions from the requirement to wear fluorescent orange exterior garments.
Title
Exempt persons hunting mountain lions from the requirement to wear fluorescent orange exterior garments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 651 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 585 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 536 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 544 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 518 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 360 |
2013-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 11. H.J. 328 |
2013-02-05 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 298 |
2013-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 26 |