SD HB1028 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Signed by Governor H.J. 761
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement that a minor be accompanied by an adult while hunting mourning doves.
Title
Repeal the requirement that a minor be accompanied by an adult while hunting mourning doves.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 761 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 597 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 560 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 568 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 544 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 518 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 246 |
2013-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 191 |
2013-01-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-24 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 164 |
2013-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 25 |