SD HB1026 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2024 H.J. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2024 H.J. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the requirement for the construction or expansion of a municipal campground or tourist accommodation facility.
Title
Clarify the requirement for the construction or expansion of a municipal campground or tourist accommodation facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Krohmer [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Liz Larson [D] |
Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Kadyn Wittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-11 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2024 H.J. 256 |
2024-01-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2024 H.J. 207 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 207 |
2024-01-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 191 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 149 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 96 |
2024-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 61 |
2024-01-11 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-11 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-11 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1026A |
2024-01-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 20 |