SD HB1026 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit eligibility for a suspended imposition of sentence for the crime of rape.
Title
Prohibit eligibility for a suspended imposition of sentence for the crime of rape.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-31 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 151 |
2022-01-31 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 158 |
2022-01-26 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-26 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 1 Amendment 1026A |
2022-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 21 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |