SD HB1006 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2024 H.J. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2024 H.J. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the amount of time permitted the Interim Rules Review Committee to review final permanent rulemaking materials.
Title
Increase the amount of time permitted the Interim Rules Review Committee to review final permanent rulemaking materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Roger Degroot [R] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. Jim Mehlhaff [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 06, 2024 H.J. 256 |
2024-01-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on January 31, 2024 H.J. 207 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 207 |
2024-01-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 191 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 149 |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-22 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 96 |
2024-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 61 |
2024-01-12 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-01-12 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2024-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 19 |