SD HB1006 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the secretary of revenue to contract with certain entities for purposes of creating or maintaining a database to determine agricultural income value and to specify the mandatory and permissive data of the database.
Title
Authorize the secretary of revenue to contract with certain entities for purposes of creating or maintaining a database to determine agricultural income value and to specify the mandatory and permissive data of the database.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirk Chaffee [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. Steven McCleerey [D] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Rep. Gary Cammack [R] | Sen. Craig Kennedy [D] | Sen. John Lake [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2020 H.J. 326 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 13, 2020 H.J. 283 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 216 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 263 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 175 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 132 |
2020-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 108 |
2020-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 108 Amendment 1006F |
2020-01-28 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-28 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1006E |
2020-01-28 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1006C |
2020-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 19 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |