SD HB1004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding petition forms for initiated measures and initiated amendments to the Constitution.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding petition forms for initiated measures and initiated amendments to the Constitution.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Karen Soli [D] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] |
Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 759 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on 2:50 p.m., March 8, 2018. H.J. 747 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 737 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 693 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-28 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 652 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-17 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 119 |
2018-01-16 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 6. H.J. 67 |
2018-01-12 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 54 |
2018-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 17 |