SD HB1001 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Signed by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Correct technical errors in statutory cross-references regarding insurance.
Title
Correct technical errors in statutory cross-references regarding insurance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 16, 2021 H.J. 293 |
2021-02-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 10, 2021 H.J. 270 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 229 |
2021-02-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 247 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 201 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 124 |
2021-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 130 |
2021-01-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-01-25 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 11 |