SC S812 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred to Spartanburg Delegation HJ-52
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Referred to Spartanburg Delegation HJ-52
Summary
A BILL TO PROVIDE THAT THE PARENT OR LEGAL GUARDIAN OF A STUDENT RESIDING IN SPARTANBURG OR UNION COUNTY AND ATTENDING SCHOOL IN SPARTANBURG OR UNION COUNTY AS A NON-RESIDENT MUST ARRANGE FOR THE STUDENT TO ATTEND A SCHOOL IN THE COUNTY RATHER THAN THE SCHOOL AUTHORITIES IN THE CHILD’S COUNTY OF RESIDENCE; AND TO PROVIDE THAT THE SCHOOL BOARD OF TRUSTEES FOR THE SCHOOL DISTRICT IN WHICH A CHILD IN SPARTANBURG OR UNION COUNTY RESIDES MAY NOT PREVENT A STUDENT FROM TRANSFERRING TO ANOTHER SCHOOL DISTRICT IN SPARTANBURG OR UNION COUNTY IF THE RECEIVING SCHOOL DISTRICT APPROVES THE TRANSFER.
Title
A Bill To Provide That The Parent Or Legal Guardian Of A Student Residing In Spartanburg Or Union County And Attending School In Spartanburg Or Union County As A Non-resident Must Arrange For The Student To Attend A School In The County Rather Than The School Authorities In The Child’s County Of Residence; And To Provide That The School Board Of Trustees For The School District In Which A Child In Spartanburg Or Union County Resides May Not Prevent A Student From Transferring To Another School District In Spartanburg Or Union County If The Receiving School District Approves The Transfer.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Bright [R] | Sen. Kevin Bryant [R] | Sen. Thomas Davis [R] | Sen. Lawrence Grooms [R] |
Sen. Shane Martin [R] | Sen. Michael Rose [R] | Sen. Phillip Shoopman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Referred to Spartanburg Delegation HJ-52 | |
2010-04-21 | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-52 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-24 | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced and read first time HJ-24 | |
2010-03-25 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-36 | |
2010-03-25 | Amended SJ-36 | |
2010-03-23 | Read second time SJ-7 | |
2010-03-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-03-18 | Amended SJ-39 | |
2010-03-10 | Amended SJ-29 | |
2010-03-10 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn SJ-29 | |
2010-03-10 | Minority Report Removed SJ-29 | |
2010-03-02 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Education SJ-22 | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Committee on Education SJ-2 | |
2009-05-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-2 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=812&session=118 |