SC S766 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-49
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-49
Pending: House Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND TITLE 23 OF THE 1976 CODE, BY ADDING CHAPTER 52, THE "NOVELTY LIGHTER PROHIBITION ACT", TO PROVIDE FOR THE DEFINITIONS AND THE PROHIBITION OF THE SALE OR DISTRIBUTION OF NOVELTY LIGHTERS AND TO PROVIDE PENALTIES.
Title
By Adding Chapter 52, The "novelty Lighter Prohibition Act", To Provide For The Definitions And The Prohibition Of The Sale Or Distribution Of Novelty Lighters And To Provide Penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry HJ-49 | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced and read first time HJ-49 | |
2010-01-28 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-8 | |
2009-05-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time SJ-30 | |
2009-05-14 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-30 | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-12 | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-4 | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced and read first time SJ-4 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=766&session=118 |