SC S593 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - Act No. 32
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-12 - Act No. 32
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND SECTION 16-23-430, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE PROHIBITION ON THE CARRYING OF WEAPONS ON SCHOOL PROPERTY, SO AS TO PROVIDE AN EXCEPTION FOR PERSONS WHO ARE AUTHORIZED TO CARRY A CONCEALED WEAPON WHEN THE WEAPON IS INSIDE A MOTOR VEHICLE AND SECURED; AND TO AMEND SECTION 16-23-420, AS AMENDED, RELATING TO THE PROHIBITION ON THE CARRYING OR DISPLAYING OF FIREARMS IN PUBLIC BUILDINGS AND ADJACENT AREAS, SO AS TO PROVIDE AN EXCEPTION ON SCHOOL PROPERTY FOR PERSONS WHO ARE AUTHORIZED TO CARRY A CONCEALED WEAPON WHEN THE WEAPON IS INSIDE A MOTOR VEHICLE AND SECURED. - ratified title
Title
Provide An Exception On School Property For Persons Who Are Authorized To Carry A Concealed Weapon When The Weapon Is Inside A Motor Vehicle And Secured. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | Act No. 32 | |
2009-06-11 | Effective date 06/02/09 | |
2009-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Ratified R 74 | |
2009-05-21 | Ordered enrolled for ratification SJ-8 | |
2009-05-20 | House recedes from amendment(s) HJ-256 | |
2009-05-20 | Non-concurrence in House amendment SJ-50 | |
2009-05-15 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-2 | |
2009-05-14 | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day HJ-65 | |
2009-05-14 | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-2 HJ-63 | |
2009-05-14 | Read second time HJ-63 | |
2009-05-14 | Amended HJ-63 | |
2009-05-13 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary HJ-34 | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-185 | |
2009-04-29 | Introduced and read first time HJ-185 | |
2009-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-29 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-8 | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time SJ-34 | |
2009-04-28 | Amended SJ-34 | |
2009-04-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-04-22 | Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Judiciary SJ-9 | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-1 | |
2009-03-18 | Introduced and read first time SJ-1 |
Same As/Similar To
S0347 (Similar To) 2009-02-02 - Referred to Subcommittee: Knotts (ch), Massey, Coleman
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=593&session=118 |