SC S185 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-24 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-19
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-24 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-19
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 56-3-230, CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, RELATING TO THE DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES APPLICATION FOR THE REGISTRATION AND LICENSING OF A VEHICLE, SO AS TO PROVIDE THAT THE APPLICATION MUST INCLUDE A VALID COPY OF THE OWNER'S SOUTH CAROLINA DRIVER'S LICENSE.
Title
Provide That The Application Must Include A Valid Copy Of The Owner's South Carolina Driver's License.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works HJ-19 | |
2009-03-24 | Introduced and read first time HJ-19 | |
2009-03-17 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-9 | |
2009-03-11 | Read second time SJ-24 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-24 | |
2009-03-11 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2009-03-10 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation SJ-18 | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-156 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-156 | |
2008-12-17 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-12-17 | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=185&session=118 |