SC S144 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Act No. 208
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Act No. 208
Summary
AN ACT TO RATIFY AN AMENDMENT TO SECTION 33, ARTICLE III OF THE CONSTITUTION OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1895, RELATING TO THE PROVISION PROVIDING THAT NO UNMARRIED WOMAN UNDER THE AGE OF FOURTEEN YEARS OLD MAY LEGALLY CONSENT TO SEXUAL INTERCOURSE, SO AS TO DELETE THAT PROVISION. - ratified title
Title
Delete That Provision. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Act No. 208 | |
2010-06-11 | Effective date 06/02/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Ratified R 285 | |
2010-05-25 | Read third time and enrolled HJ-117 | |
2010-05-12 | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 HJ-43 | |
2010-05-12 | Read second time HJ-43 | |
2010-04-27 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, May 4, 2010 HJ-123 | |
2010-04-20 | Requests for debate-Rep(s). Kennedy, Ott, Weeks, Jefferson, Duncan, Hardwick, and Mack HJ-68 | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary HJ-10 | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary HJ-108 | |
2009-05-12 | Introduced and read first time HJ-108 | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-10 | |
2009-05-07 | Read second time SJ-25 | |
2009-05-07 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-25 | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-7 | |
2009-04-16 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Shoopman | |
2009-01-13 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-140 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced and read first time SJ-140 | |
2008-12-10 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2008-12-10 | Prefiled |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=144&session=118 |