SC S1401 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence HJ-21
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence HJ-21
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO DESIGNATE MAY 5, 2010, AS "SOUTH CAROLINA CLEAN HANDS DAY", AND TO ENCOURAGE ALL SOUTH CAROLINIANS TO RECOGNIZE DAILY THE IMPORTANCE OF PROPER HAND HYGIENE TO REDUCE AND PREVENT THE SPREAD OF INFECTIONS AND TO DISCUSS PROPER HAND HYGIENE WITH FAMILIES, FRIENDS, AND HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS.
Title
Designate May 5, 2010, As "south Carolina Clean Hands Day", And To Encourage All South Carolinians To Recognize Daily The Importance Of Proper Hand Hygiene To Reduce And Prevent The Spread Of Infections And To Discuss Proper Hand Hygiene With Families, Friends, And Health Care Providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence HJ-21 | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference SJ-14 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1401&session=118 |