SC S1353 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Disclosure Of Economic Interests By Public Officers And Employees, To Require A Person That Is Required To File The Statement To File For Any Year In Which That Person Holds Office For Any Portion Of The Year.
Title
Disclosure of economic interest by public officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-06-05 | Introduced and read first time | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2012-05-30 | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-3 | |
2012-05-30 | Read second time | |
2012-05-30 | Roll call Ayes-23 Nays-16 | |
2012-05-30 | Amended | |
2012-05-23 | Amended | |
2012-05-22 | Amended | |
2012-04-24 | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced and read first time |