SC S1334 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-24 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 178 In Orangeburg County From Its Intersection With Bethel Forest Road To Its Intersection With Gordon Drive "melvin L. Crum Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain The Words "melvin L. Crum Memorial Highway".
Title
Melvin L. Crum Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence | |
2012-04-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-04-19 | Debate adjourned until Tues., 04-24-12 | |
2012-04-18 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2012-03-22 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced | |
2012-03-21 | Adopted, sent to House | |
2012-03-21 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2012-03-20 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced |