SC S1310 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Juncture Of Green Lane And South Carolina Highway 15 In Lee County "arthur Brown Crossroads" And To Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location That Contain This Designation.
Title
Arthur Brown Crossroads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-05-24 | House | Introduced |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Introduced |