SC S1276 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-01 - Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Suspend The Provisions Of Act 58 Of 2023, Relating To The Board Of Trustees For The Veterans' Trust Fund Of South Carolina, Until June 1, 2026.
Title
Veteran's Trust Fund Board of Trustees Terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2024-05-01 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Family and Veterans' Services |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |