SC S1260 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-10 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Declare May 22, 2012, As Free Clinic Awareness Day In South Carolina.
Title
Free Clinic Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced |