SC S1210 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Senate Resolution To Recognize April 6, 2022, "sto Programs Day" In South Carolina And To Encourage Individuals, Families, And Businesses To Learn More About The Consumer-facing Programs Offered At The State Treasurer's Office.
Title
STO Programs Day recognized as April 6, 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar without reference |