SC S1204 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - Act No. 140
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 7-7-430, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The Designation Of Voting Precincts In Oconee County, So As To Update The Map Number On Which The Names Of These Precincts May Be Found And Maintained By The Revenue And Fiscal Affairs Office. - Ratified Title
Title
Elections - Oconee County Voting Precincts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | Act No. 140 | |
2022-04-29 | Effective date 04/25/22 | |
2022-04-25 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-04-21 | Ratified R 153 | |
2022-04-20 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2022-04-19 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2022-04-19 | House | Read second time |
2022-04-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |