SC S1177 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-27 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
A BILL TO AMEND SECTION 8-27-10 OF THE 1976 CODE, RELATING TO THE DEFINITION OF A REPORT AS USED IN THE WHISTLEBLOWER STATUTE, TO PROVIDE THAT TESTIMONY GIVEN TO A STANDING COMMITTEE, SUBCOMMITTEE OF A STANDING COMMITTEE, OR A STUDY COMMITTEE OF THE SENATE OR HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES IS ENTITLED TO THE PROTECTIONS OF THE WHISTLEBLOWER STATUTE.
Title
Relating To The Definition Of A Report As Used In The Whistleblower Statute, To Provide That Testimony Given To A Standing Committee, Subcommittee Of A Standing Committee, Or A Study Committee Of The Senate Or House Of Representatives Is Entitled To The Protections Of The Whistleblower Statute.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Campbell [R] | Sen. Creighton Coleman [D] | Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] | Sen. Michael Fair [R] |
Sen. Glenn Reese [D] | Sen. Michael Rose [R] | Sen. Phillip Shoopman [R] | Sen. Kent Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-18 | |
2010-04-22 | Amended SJ-18 | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time SJ-24 | |
2010-04-15 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-24 | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-62 | |
2010-02-19 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Cleary, Scott | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-3 | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced and read first time SJ-3 |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1177&session=118 |