SC S1134 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Adopted, sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Rename The Portion Of South Carolina Highway 124 In Greenville County From Its Intersection With United States Highway 123 To The Greenville County Line From "joe Anders Highway" To "joe Anders Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain This Designation.
Title
Joe Anders Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2016-03-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced |