SC S1117 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Act No. 181
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 2 Of Chapter 41, Title 46, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, Relating To The South Carolina Grain Producers Guaranty Fund, So As To Expand The Fund To Include Cotton Producers, To Define The Terms "agricultural Commodity" And "agricultural Commodity Dealer", To Revise The Definition Of The Term "fair Market Value" To Include Value Based On The Average Market Price Paid To Producers Licensed By Three Licensed Cotton Dealers Under Certain Circumstances, To Delete The Term "grain Dealer" And Its Definition, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "producer" To Include Producers Of Cotton, To Substitute The Term "commodity" For The Term "grain" In The Definition Of The Term "date Of Loss", To Provide An Assessment Amount For A Bale Of Cotton, To Revise The Provision Relating To Whom Delivery Must Be Made For The Imposition Of Assessments, To Revise The Places Where The Assessments Shall Be Collected, To Revise Where Assessments Must Be Reported And Remitted To The Department Of Agriculture, To Substitute The Term "agricultural Commodity" For The Term "grain", To Revise The Persons For Whom The Fund Is Established To Benefit, To Increase The Amount The Fund Must Accumulate In Order To Suspend Assessments, To Revise The Procedure To File And Satisfy Claims For Losses Incurred For Certain Commodities, To Revise The Dates When Assessments Must Be Remitted To And Certain Reports Filed With The Department, To Establish The South Carolina Agricultural Commodities Commission Advisory Commission To Make Recommendations To The Department Regarding The Duties Of The Department In Administering The Grain And Cotton Producers Guaranty Fund, And To Provide For Its Membership, Powers, And Duties; To Amend Section 46-41-60, Relating To Surety Bonds Or Equivalent Security Required Of Applicants For Dealer In Agricultural Products Licenses, So As To Provide For Surety Bonds Or Their Equivalents Based On A Tiered System; And To Amend Section 46-41-170, Relating To Penalties, So As To Make Conforming Changes, To Provide The Insurance Reserve Fund Of The State Fiscal Accountability Authority Is Authorized To Lend Certain Amounts Of Money To The Department For The Use Of The Grain And Cotton Producers Guaranty Fund For Certain Purposes, To Provide For The Repayment Of The Loan, And To Provide For The Use Of Funds Not Derived From Assessments To Reimburse Claims Or Losses. - Ratified Title
Title
SC Grain Producers Guaranty Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Wes Climer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Act No. 181 | |
2022-05-31 | Effective date 05/16/22 | |
2022-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2022-05-12 | Ratified R 186 | |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2022-05-04 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-05-04 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2022-05-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-1 |
2022-05-03 | House | Read second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Amended |
2022-04-29 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-29 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-16 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |