SC S1102 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Express Appreciation To Professionals Who Advocate On Behalf Of Those Suffering From Mental Illness, As Well As To The Volunteers Who Assist Them, And To Declare Wednesday, March 6, 2024 As "mental Health Advocacy Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Mental Health Advocacy Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Introduced, adopted, returned with concurrence |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Adopted, sent to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=1102&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/1102_20240227.htm |