SC S1054 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

A Senate Resolution To Recognize May 2018 As "better Hearing And Speech Month" In South Carolina And To Encourage All South Carolinians To Become Informed About This Critical Health Issue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Better Hearing and Speech Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateAdopted
2018-03-16 Scrivener's error corrected
2018-03-15SenateCommittee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
2018-02-27SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-02-27SenateIntroduced

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback