SC S1035 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-12 - Act No. 221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Create Julian's Law, To Authorize The Establishment Of Statewide Investigation Of New Drug Applications Approved By The Federal Drug Administration That Allow Treatment Of Patients With Certain Forms Of Epilepsy With Cannabidiol As Part Of Clinical Trials, To Provide Immunity From Arrest, Prosecution, And Other Penalties; To Repeal Section 44-53-150 Relating To A Review Of Criminal Penalties For Sale And Use Of Marijuana; And To Create A Study Committee To Develop A Plan For The Sale And Use Of Medical Marijuana

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Cannabis Therapeutic Treatment Research Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-12 Act No. 221
2014-06-11 Effective date 06/02/14
2014-06-02 Signed By Governor
2014-05-29 Ratified R 229
2014-05-22HouseRoll call Yeas-92 Nays-5
2014-05-22HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2014-05-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-05-20SenateReturned to House with amendments
2014-05-20SenateRoll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2014-05-20SenateHouse amendment amended
2014-05-15 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-05-15HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2014-05-14HouseRoll call Yeas-78 Nays-19
2014-05-14HouseRead second time
2014-05-14HouseAmended
2014-05-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-05-07HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
2014-04-02HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2014-04-02HouseRecalled from Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2014-04-01HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2014-04-01HouseIntroduced and read first time
2014-03-27SenateRead third time and sent to House
2014-03-26SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
2014-03-26SenateRead second time
2014-03-26SenateAmended
2014-03-25SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2014-03-21 Scrivener's error corrected
2014-03-20SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
2014-02-19SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

H4803 (Similar To) 2014-05-21 - Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4453110(n/a)See Bill Text
4453150(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=1035&session=120&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140219.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140320.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140321.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140325.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140326.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140508.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140514.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140515.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140520.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/1035_20140521.htm
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=7630
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=8047
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=8263

Bill Comments

feedback