SC H4803 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-21 - Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Enact The "medical Cannabis Therapeutic Treatment Research Act", To Establish The Medical Cannabis Therapeutic Treatment Research Program At The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, To Provide For Patients Eligible To Participate In The Program, To Provide Who And Under What Circumstances Medical Cannabis Can Be Administered To A Patient, To Provide For Notice To A Participating Patient That The Patient Will Be Participating In A Research Study And Of The Experimental Nature Of The Medical Cannabis Program, To Provide For The Protection Of A Participating Patient's Personal Information, To Provide For The Operation Of The Program By The Director Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, To Provide Reporting Requirements By Academic Medical Centers That Supervise Or Administer Medical Cannabis Treatments, To Provide Criminal And Civil Immunity From State Actions Or Suits Arising From The Proper Implementation Of This Act, To Provide That The State Shall Defend State Employees Who, In Good Faith, Carry Out The Provisions Of This Act, And To Require The Department Of Health And Environmental Control To Collaborate With Academic Medical Centers To Assist Interested Patients With The Application Process To Participate In Existing United States Food And Drug Administration-approved Investigational New Drug Studies Concerning Medical Cannabis.
Title
Medical Cannabis Therapeutic Treatment Research Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 90 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs |
2014-04-03 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-04-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-24 |
2014-04-02 | House | Read second time |
2014-04-02 | House | Amended |
2014-04-02 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight |
2014-03-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-1-14 |
2014-03-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter |
2014-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2014-03-11 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: K.R.Crawford |
2014-03-10 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, McCoy |
2014-03-06 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1035 (Similar To) 2014-06-12 - Act No. 221